THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:44:44 AM
Crystal, Eugene
CPSO#:
75607
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Sep 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Vitebsk State Medical Institute, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Cardiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7370
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:23 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 21 Aug 2002
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Sep 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Nov 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Nov 2012 |
|
Active |