THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:58:00 AM
Chu, Michael Wayne Art
CPSO#:
75592
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Nov 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Room B6-106
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3593
Fax: (519) 663-3595
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL WAYNE ART CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2000 to 14 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2001 to 14 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2002 to 14 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2003 to 14 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2004 to 14 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2007 |