THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:42:16 AM
Guay, Nicolas Antonio
CPSO#:
75577
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
29 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
29-Sep-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nicolas A. Guay Medicine Professional Corporation / Nicolas A. Guay Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 29 Sep 2020 |