THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 22:16:30 PM
Kazmi, Asif Abbas
CPSO#:
75569
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-0800
Fax: (705) 797-0900
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASIF ABBAS KAZMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |