THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:19:15 AM
Leary, Tara Jean
CPSO#:
75563
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-36 Elgin St
Recovery North
Sudbury ON P3C 5B4
Phone: 7068063737
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Espanola General Hospital |
Espanola |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TARA JEAN LEARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEARY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 28 Feb 2001
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2001 |