THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:23:13 AM
Treki, Ibrahim Mustafa
CPSO#:
75558
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2224 Walker Rd
unit 131
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Phone: (519)250-9119
Fax: (519) 250-9779
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2001 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2017 |
|
Active |