THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:00:38 AM
Ali, Madi Mohamed Madi
CPSO#:
75546
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Al-Arab Medical University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West Room 248
P O Box 2000
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46698
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MADI MOHAMED MADI ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2002 to 30 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2004 to 30 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2006 |