THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:42:28 PM
Hamilton, David Mark Patrick
CPSO#:
75509
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
suite 402
2039 Robertson road
Nepean ON K2H 8R2
Phone: (613) 7965935
Fax: 3432700771
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Jul 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID MARK PATRICK HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 19 Jun 2000 to 14 Jul 2000
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2000 to 14 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 13 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 14 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 19 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2003 |