THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 5:57:17 AM
Cameron, Bruce Douglas
CPSO#:
75492
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
370 Elmwood dr.
Moncton NB E1A 8R5
Phone: 506 380-1921
Fax: 506 855-3545
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRUCE DOUGLAS CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2010 |