THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:08:10 PM
McDonough, Erin Therese
CPSO#:
75485
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 82833 Rpo Cabbagetown
Toronto ON M5A 3Y2
Phone: 647 888 0142
Fax: 437 317 9632
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIN THERESE MCDONOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONOUGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2007 |