THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:02:51 AM
Potter, Jennifer Ann
CPSO#:
75482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
East End Community Health Centre
1619 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M4L 1G4
Phone: (416) 778-5858
Fax: (416) 778-5855
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN POTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2000 to 24 Jul 2000
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2001 to 30 Mar 2001
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Mar 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2001 |