THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:44:16 AM
Delgado, Diego Hernan
CPSO#:
75468
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Nov 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Nov 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Universidad del Salvador, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
11 P M B 136
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3940
Fax: (416) 340-3475
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:15 Nov 2002 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
|
Active |