THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:56:32 AM
Morelli, Moreno
CPSO#:
75466
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
240-3100 Boul De La Côte-Vertu
Saint-Laurent QC H4R 2J8
Phone: 514-819-1015
Fax: 514-819-1016
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Moreno Morelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 22 2010
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:12 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MORENO MORELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORELLI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2001 |