THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:03:55 AM
Khulbe, Suman
CPSO#:
75449
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Khulbe, Suman Skye (used until: 19 Dec 2001 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Karma Wellness
5 Windgate Crescent
K2M-2X8
Kanata ON K2M 2X8
Phone: (613) 614-3825
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUMAN KHULBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHULBE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 16 May 2001 to 03 Jun 2001
EL - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2001 |
Pending Hearings
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Khulbe’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Khulbe engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to a patient by engaging in a sexual relationship with the patient, failing to maintain appropriate boundaries including in her conduct and communications, and inappropriately administering medication and/or other substances and/or inappropriately providing the patient with medication and/or other substances, and having the patient inappropriately administer medication and/or substances to her. In addition, it is also alleged that Dr. Khulbe engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to patients including by, but not limited to, failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with patients, including in her conduct and communications, inappropriately administering medications and/or other substances to patients, and inappropriately disclosing personal health information. In addition, it is also alleged that Dr. Khulbe engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including, but not limited to, by failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with patients including by hosting social gatherings and/or parties at her medical practice, that patients attended; consuming alcohol with and/or in the presence of patients; and inappropriately administering medication and/or other substances to others and to herself and/or having others inappropriately administer to her.
Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Motion; March 04, 05, 06 & April 02, 2024