THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 22:45:49 PM
El-Sayed, Samy Mohamed
CPSO#:
75443
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Mansoura University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: El-Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:31 May 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jun 2022 |