THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:15:43 AM
Leong, Wey-Liang
CPSO#:
75410
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite OPG 6-721
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2992
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:04 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WEY-LIANG LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2002 |