THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:55:07 AM
Chawla, Punita Tanya
CPSO#:
75359
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 567 5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6584
Fax: (416) 586-8695
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:16 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PUNITA TANYA CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2006 |