THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:04:25 PM
Tabib, Mohamed Ahmed
CPSO#:
75356
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1995 Lens Ave
55 Edinborough Street
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52796
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED TABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABIB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Dec 2006
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2006 |