THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:57:42 PM
Alsefaou, Abdualla Omaro Ab
CPSO#:
75351
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2647
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDUALLA OMARO AB ALSEFAOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSEFAOU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2008 |