THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:51:10 PM
Panjwani, Gulshan Dilip
CPSO#:
75347
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: Saurashtra University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301-295 College St
Toronto ON M5T 1S2
Phone: 4166039531
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GULSHAN DILIP PANJWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANJWANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Apr 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2004 |