THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:48:47 PM
Menlove, James Frederick
CPSO#:
75285
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:17 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES FREDERICK MENLOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENLOVE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2003 |