THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:19:47 AM
Dantzer, Dale Victor
CPSO#:
75259
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
240 Duncan Mill Rd
Suite 800
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: 416-492-5633
Fax: 416-495-1590
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Turks and Caicos Islands
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALE VICTOR DANTZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANTZER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |