THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:50:44 AM
Grewal, Anita
CPSO#:
75253
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate
unit 221
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: 905 334 8210
Fax: 289 715 2981
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Anita Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANITA GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2002 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2020 |