THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:19:29 AM
Margulies, Niculina Mariana
CPSO#:
75246
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
302-1315 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 2G6
Phone: 416 634 0001
Fax: 416 634 0002
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:26 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICULINA MARIANA MARGULIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGULIES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2004 |