THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:36:28 AM
Cosma, Rodica
CPSO#:
75241
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jan 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jan 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
K-W Walk-In Clinic
100 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON N2N 0B1
Phone: 519-279-4098
Fax: 519-279-4099
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Cosma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RODICA COSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2003 |