THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:01:23 PM
Hataley, Joy Marie
CPSO#:
75225
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301 Ext. 225
Electoral District: 06
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy/transfer of their medical record can contact the Frontenac Medical Clinic & Associates at 791 Princess St., Suite 201, Kingston, ON., K7L 1E9, Tel: 613-544-2727, Fax: 613-544-7247.
Date Received: 05 May 2020
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOY MARIE HATALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HATALEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 12 Jan 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2000 |