THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:13:00 AM
Robinson, Andrew George
CPSO#:
75214
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Ctr of Southeastern Ontario
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:14 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW GEORGE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2001 to 29 Jul 2001
EL - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2001 to 24 Aug 2001
EL - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2004 |