THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:34:17 AM
Vozoris, Socrates Andrew
CPSO#:
75213
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Thomas Jefferson University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Cardiology Clinic
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 47103
Fax: 855-720-1223
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Oct 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOCRATES ANDREW VOZORIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOZORIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Apr 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2006 |