THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:54:33 PM
Spacek, Stan Zdenek
CPSO#:
75204
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Clinic
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON N7A 4N8
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:17 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STAN ZDENEK SPACEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPACEK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2003 |