THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:39:11 AM
Dueck, Dorie-Anna Corinne Constance
CPSO#:
75189
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Saskatoon Cancer Centre
20 Campus Drive
Saskatoon SK S7N 4H4
Phone: (306) 655-2662
Fax: (306) 655-2910
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dorie-Anna Dueck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 26 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:10 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DORIE-ANNA CORINNE CONSTANCE DUECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUECK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 24 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2003 |