THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:33:14 AM
Sharma, Sangita
CPSO#:
75188
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5045 Mainway
Avella Injury and Pain Management C
Burlington ON L7L 5H9
Phone: 905-315-7007
Fax: 289-714-2516
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANGITA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2008 |