THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:47:22 AM
Layne, Elizabeth Cleopatra
CPSO#:
75181
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 844-7770
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jul 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CLEOPATRA LAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAYNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2005 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2006 |