THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:40:45 PM
Gallimore, Christopher Hugh
CPSO#:
75180
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 237-4901
Fax: (905) 237-4906
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:29 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HUGH GALLIMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLIMORE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 09 Jan 2006
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jan 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2011 |