THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:46:32 PM
Singh, Gita
CPSO#:
75171
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Boxgrove Medical Centre
204-110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 471-8222
Fax: (905) 471-8822
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GITA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2006 |