THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:06:26 PM
Iglesias, Ivan Ramon
CPSO#:
75153
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8300
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
|
Active |