THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:34:37 PM
McReelis, Kylen Darby
CPSO#:
75147
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6879
Fax: (705) 740-6836
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KYLEN DARBY MCREELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCREELIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2005 |