THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:21:28 PM
Grenier, Catherine Marie Marguerite
CPSO#:
75142
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIE MARGUERITE GRENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRENIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |