THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:04:49 AM
Hsiao, Janey Shih Chi
CPSO#:
75141
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058832153
Fax: 9058832156
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:21 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANEY SHIH CHI HSIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIAO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2005 to 06 May 2005
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 May 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2005 |