THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:02:54 AM
Higgins, Louise Jane
CPSO#:
75132
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Saugeen Shores Medical Building
36 Grey Street North
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOUISE JANE HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2002 |