THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:22:27 PM
Mori, Michael Kiyoshi
CPSO#:
75122
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
24 First Street
Orangeville ON L9W 2C7
Phone: (519) 943-0712
Fax: (519) 943-0284
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jul 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KIYOSHI MORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2002 |