THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:29:16 PM
Verma, Subodh
CPSO#:
75100
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Calgary, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Terrence Donnelly Heart Centre
Cardiovascular & Thoracic Surgery
Suite 8 003 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5997
Fax: (416) 864-5881
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:17 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUBODH VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2007 |