THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:51:38 AM
Baker, Steven Kent
CPSO#:
75097
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Neuromuscular Disease Clinic
McMaster University HSC 2H22
1200 Main Street
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76946
Fax: (905) 521-2656
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN KENT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |