THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 12:51:27 PM
Saibil, Romy Beth
CPSO#:
75090
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
168 Dunblaine Ave
North York ON M5M 2S5
Phone: 6477464926
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Romy Saibil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROMY BETH SAIBIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAIBIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2001 to 31 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2003 to 30 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2003 |