THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 11:36:38 AM
Myers, Jeffrey Adam
CPSO#:
75067
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
405-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Phone: 416-640-0892
Fax: 416-640-1243
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:31 Dec 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ADAM MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2005 |