THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:31:30 AM
Nguyen, Thao Elsie
CPSO#:
75063
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital UHN
Department of Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Room 1-295, Munk Building
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3291
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THAO ELSIE NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2007 |