THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:52:25 PM
Weir, Tara Grace
CPSO#:
75049
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Dec 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 28 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2001 to 27 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2002 to 27 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Sep 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tara Grace Weir to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 6, 2020:
Dr. Weir has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.