THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:45:17 PM
Fung, Leslie Caesar
CPSO#:
75042
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Phone: 416-461-9471
Fax: 416-461-2710
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Corporation Name: Dr. Leslie Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2016
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLIE CAESAR FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2006 |