THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:04:36 PM
Han, Ra Kyung
CPSO#:
75034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Nov 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:14 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RA KYUNG HAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2006 |