THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:50:40 PM
Coombes, Robin Deneys
CPSO#:
75028
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBIN DENEYS COOMBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOMBES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2005 |