THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:33:50 PM
Frank, Andrew Robert
CPSO#:
74998
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Nov 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Nov 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 342Y
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6322
Fax: (613) 562-6013
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW ROBERT FRANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2006 |